Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREYFRIARS READING
Charity number: 1129381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Gilmour Walker | Chair | 18 January 2016 |
|
|||||
MARTIN WILLIAM HALEY | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Hall | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sven Lewis | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Brown | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malveen Raheja | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinedu Orji | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Eapen | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Davy Nyirongo | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Tuvey | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Francis Talib | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maddie Kulkarni | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
bernard Daniel | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Diaz | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Andrew Aubrey-Jones | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Natalie Worsfold | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Booth | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neville Austin Greaves | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rachel Harrop | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katryna Seals | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jeffries | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Summers | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Nhau | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Cross | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lam | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stone | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Frederick Missenden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN DAVID LEDGER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.