LEYLAND BAND

Charity number: 1129485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £58.35k £60.28k £48.68k £57.91k £54.10k
Total expenditure £55.55k £55.65k £51.09k £61.37k £58.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A