Accounts and annual returns ST SWITHUN WELLS PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1129731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required