Financial history ST SWITHUN WELLS PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1129731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £13.85k £18.31k £10.20k £6.71k £1.99k
Total expenditure £10.94k £25.46k £7.65k £3.48k £11.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £423 £0 N/A N/A N/A