FRIENDS OF ST ANN'S STRETFORD

Charity number: 1131356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2021 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 March 2019 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 November 2017 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required