Trustees LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129905

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Marie-Anne Kent | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
John Clifton Durkin | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Margaret Huddleston | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sonya Tolley Marshall | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Moira Chadwick | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tom Chadwick | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Elizabeth Beirne | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Ernest Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Hardiman | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Wallbank | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Anthony Huddleston | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joan Vera Hayward | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Trencher | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Parkinson | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Sharon Plant | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Frank Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WILLIAM POTTS | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher George Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Patrick Michael Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Malcolm Tate | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||||
Mrs Jean McKenna | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN SCHOFIELD ATTWATER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SHIRLEY ANNE POTTS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARGARET CROSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
OLWEN EMMA WALSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL JOHN GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.