THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ON THE HILL, CHESTER

Charity number: 1132533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 January 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 August 2017 On time Download