THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ON THE HILL, CHESTER

Charity number: 1132533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £265.77k £676.72k £383.86k £215.99k £229.22k
Total expenditure £302.54k £531.83k £935.95k £190.04k £180.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £30.00k N/A N/A £2.23k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £656.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £17.21k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £3.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £8.50k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £531.83k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £508 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £300 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A