THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ON THE HILL, CHESTER

Charity number: 1132533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Ann Fryer Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Rev Laura Claire Rhodes Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Emma Jane Degg Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
MRS ALISON MCLELLAN BA Trustee None on record
Rev Richard Patrick Whaite Chair 07 October 2019
THE LLAY ESTATE Received: On time
Patricial Lynne Jones Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
CATHERINE JONES Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Joanne Dee Lewis- Palmer Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
David Albert Gilburt Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Helen Mary Brophy Trustee 25 April 2021
THE LLAY ESTATE Received: On time
PETER COLLINS Trustee
THE ABBEYFIELD CHESTER SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
DENISE PARKIN Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
MAVIS SELLERS Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
JOHN HUTCHISON SCOTT ACMA Trustee 15 September 2011 None on record
Guy Shapland Trustee 24 April 2018 None on record