TREASURED CRAFTS

Charity number: 1131337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.55k £3.08k £2.67k £2.67k £1.45k
Total expenditure £1.93k £1.54k £1.13k £1.34k £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A