KERALA CULTURAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION (KCWA)

Charity number: 1131931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £48.37k £30.54k £41.62k £23.38k £22.80k
Total expenditure £50.87k £31.29k £33.45k £22.59k £26.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A