NRC SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1130959
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Running social activities for present and past clients of the Royal Free Neurological Rehabilitation Centre (and its predecessor the Marie Foster Centre) and their families and carers. Providing medical equipment and other facilities for use at the Centre. Providing financial assistance to present and past clients for the purchase of items to help with their rehabilitation or disability.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021

Total income: £7
Total expenditure: £7,405

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Brent
  • Enfield
  • Haringey
  • Harrow
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2009: Standard registration
  • 08 April 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 08 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1165672 THE ROYAL FREE CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MFC SUPPORT (Working name)
  • MARIE FOSTER CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £7.77k £2.60k £33.15k £3 £7
Total expenditure £8.53k £3.08k £2.44k £3.42k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 February 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 June 2021 504 days late