Accounts and annual returns BOLTON METHODIST MISSION

Charity number: 1130745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 September 2019 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 September 2019 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window