Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHIPLAKE WITH DUNSDEN
Charity number: 1138065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Sydney Thewsey | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Louise Robins | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Appleby | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Flinn | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cyril John Crouch | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Heather Glithro | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sheridan Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
John William Bodman | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jean ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.