Trustees HARROW BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Christine Jackson-Hales | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Artus | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Frederick Hughes | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cristian Dubac | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Jeffreys | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN LEECH | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL FOX | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROSS NEWBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.