Esh Winning Residents Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group works in partnership with others to provide a safe, vibrant and inclusive community. It holds regular meeting open to the general public and supports and delivers a range of projects and initiatives to improve the physical and economic conditions for the inhabitants of our area without distinction of sex, race, age, disability or political, religious or other opinions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 11 February 2010: Standard registration
- ESH WINNING RESIDENTS (Working name)
- ESH WINNING RESIDENTS GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edwin Herbert Simpson | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Kevin Maurice Mackay | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Florence Diana Simpson | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Mather | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JOSEPH KELLEY | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £0 | £5.66k | £11.07k | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £25 | £1.50k | £8.06k | £8.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 29 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
A) THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ESH WINNING AREA (HEREAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE, RACE, DISABILITY OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE ESH WINNING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 DENE PARK
ESH WINNING
DURHAM
DH7 9JE
- Phone:
- 07970178530
- Email:
- kelleyjckll@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window