RAF Benson Junior Ranks Welfare Fund

Charity Number: 1129706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Service Funds are estabilished for the benefit of Service personnel to promote efficiency which underpins esprit de corps and team working.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,019
Total expenditure: £26,326

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAF BENSON SIF (Working name)
  • SERVICE INSTITUTE FUND RAF BENSON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Tierney MA RAF Trustee 19 September 2024
OFFICERS' MESS RAF BENSON
Received: On time
SERGEANTS' MESS RAF BENSON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.70k £50.79k £24.78k £42.02k £29.02k
Total expenditure £24.77k £29.88k £25.85k £32.64k £26.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 May 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 May 2024 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 May 2023 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 03 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Royal Air Force
Benson
Wallingford
OX10 6AA
Phone:
01491825378
Website:

No information available