Financial history ST DAVID'S COLLEGE PTA

Charity number: 1132292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £22.81k £16.44k £18.26k £10.37k £2.91k
Total expenditure £13.36k £19.61k £16.83k £9.89k £8.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A