ELM HALL DRIVE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 August 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 August 2020 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 03 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 December 2016 On time Download