Trustees ELM HALL DRIVE METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE ANNELLS | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SURENDRAN THURAIRAJA | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John Goodwin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
FREDA ROSEMARY HORNE | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Davies | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Kershaw | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Obeth Thevanesan | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES HARDISTY | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BULLOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATE HARRISON | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNY DOONAN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Harvey | Trustee | 01 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN RUTH REDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Adam Dunsmore | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDWARD WILLIAM JOHN MESSAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH MARY SUTCLIFFE BSC,DIPCOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN PAYNE MA, BED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.