The Methodist Church Barnsley North West

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Methodist Church exists to share the word and love of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £5,175 from 7 government contract(s) and £5,175 from 7 government grant(s)
People

24 Trustee(s)
134 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
Governance
- 24 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- EMMANUEL METHODIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Ann Jones | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Watson | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Woodward | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wan Foong Loh | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
LESLIE HOWARTH | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Beverley June Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stanley Dawson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lyn Patricia Gregg | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Evans | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Trevor Harris | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Hamby | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kenneth Bonson | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Allan Wearmouth | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sarah Padgett | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Sutcliffe | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wilson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwenyth Harrison | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Avril Elsie Dyson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Harrington | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Angela Carol Findlow | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Dawson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Jacqueline Grimes | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|||||
David Raymond Grimes | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAN ELDRED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.70k | £196.76k | £251.78k | £262.54k | £291.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.83k | £164.89k | £236.29k | £274.73k | £279.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.19k | N/A | £11.55k | N/A | £5.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)" as amended on 27 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Methodist Church
72 Huddersfield Road
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S75 1DT
- Phone:
- 01226 321522
- Email:
- circuitoffice@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
barnsleymethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window