Financial history DEFENCE ACADEMY STATION & WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1132359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £334.55k £289.73k £69.97k £33.42k £51.77k
Total expenditure £342.91k £304.52k £81.66k £25.00k £71.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A