Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWARK ON TRENT ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST LEONARD

Charity number: 1131972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £287.73k £250.22k £250.53k £228.29k £271.95k
Total expenditure £339.42k £241.23k £281.93k £266.61k £269.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A