Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF LEIGH, (DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD)
Charity number: 1130512
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Elizabeth Macallan | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Pink | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Charles Gordon Jell | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jean Chapman | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Alden | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Irene Harwood | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Wilkins | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Monk | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilkins | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Hackett | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meri Sams | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY MARGARET STOWE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marcus Anthony Pittman | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHERRY ELIZABETH SANDOVER PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD VICTOR JAMES MCLERNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE MARY FOLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.