PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FINCHAMPSTEAD AND CALIFORNIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

27 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES' PCC, FINCHAMPSTEAD (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES' FINCHAMPSTEAD (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gemma Louise Donnell | Chair | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Jane Green | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marsden | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Morwenna Case | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elisabeth Alder | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Sampson | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Moore | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudio Daniele Zabbia | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Wynne Owen | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elisabeth Annabel Bowers | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Fowler | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Allcock | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Allen | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Golding | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOY SCOVELL | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Marsden | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian McAllen | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alder | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Hembra | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY JANE MITCHELL-WRIGHT | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THELMA ELIZABETH CAMPBELL | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ASHLYN PAMELA WEBSTER | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE STALKER | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN ANNE FOX | Trustee |
|
||||||
SARAH JANE BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA ALDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD GLENDWR OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.27k | £340.08k | £405.87k | £304.33k | £346.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.65k | £316.49k | £374.72k | £346.19k | £380.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | N/A | N/A | £800 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Church Office
The Manor House
Church Lane
Finchampstead
Berkshire
RG40 4LU
- Phone:
- 01189730133
- Email:
- office@pfc-church.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window