Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FINCHAMPSTEAD AND CALIFORNIA
Charity Number: 1130075

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gemma Louise Donnell | Chair | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Jane Green | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marsden | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Morwenna Case | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elisabeth Alder | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet Sampson | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Moore | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudio Daniele Zabbia | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Wynne Owen | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elisabeth Annabel Bowers | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Fowler | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Allcock | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Allen | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Golding | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOY SCOVELL | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Marsden | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian McAllen | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alder | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin William Hembra | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY JANE MITCHELL-WRIGHT | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THELMA ELIZABETH CAMPBELL | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ASHLYN PAMELA WEBSTER | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE STALKER | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN ANNE FOX | Trustee |
|
||||||
SARAH JANE BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA ALDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD GLENDWR OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.