THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF LOUGHTON ST MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in Loughton , Essex our current activities are ; - public worship open to all, - pastoral work (e.g. among the sick/bereaved), - teaching Christianity, - taking schools religious assemblies,youth activities with a Christian ethos, - promotion of Christianity and of the whole mission of the church in the community. - provision of space for private prayer and contemplation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 22 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARYS LOUGHTON PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MALCOLM CRAWFORD MACDONALD MA,MLIT,BT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yvonne Merle | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phil Woolston | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Payne | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Joy Washington | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Elwes | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brooke Smith | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Maria Kuilenburg | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David William Ayers | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lambden | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Miller | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Manning | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hartley | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOSEPH MILNE | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Dronsfield | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR PAUL JOHN CURRY PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.79k | £334.28k | £359.49k | £400.86k | £414.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £421.52k | £389.92k | £401.55k | £482.63k | £479.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
201 High Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 1BB
- Phone:
- 02085083643
- Email:
- office@stmarysloughton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window