THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1129835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tabitha Rachel Appleyard Trustee 21 April 2018
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Max Halbert Trustee 06 April 2019
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Claire Mason Trustee 22 April 2017
ST MATTHEWS PARISH ROOMS Received: On time
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Rob Murray Trustee 21 April 2018
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Joan Winter Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Zoe Binns Trustee 06 April 2019
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Dr Sujit Sivasundaram Trustee 18 April 2015
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Andrew Perrett Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
NIC LAWRENCE Trustee 22 June 2011
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Justine Rachel Fieth Trustee 06 October 2020
LA LECHE LEAGUE GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
George Onyango Okal Trustee 21 April 2018
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Joo Ching Lloyd Trustee 22 April 2017
ST MATTHEWS PARISH ROOMS Received: On time
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
Jonathan Davies Trustee 06 April 2019
ST MATTHEWS PARISH ROOMS Received: On time
TRUST OF MRS E M SIDGWICK Received: On time
FRANK LEA PRICE Chair None on record