CARSHALTON BEECHES BAPTIST FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1130318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 June 2016 On time Download