CARSHALTON BEECHES BAPTIST FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1130318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £303.23k £280.03k £268.82k £282.03k £288.39k
Total expenditure £260.73k £284.53k £232.71k £323.19k £352.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.40k £0 £0 N/A £4.56k