Trustees CARSHALTON BEECHES BAPTIST FREE CHURCH
Charity number: 1130318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Hugh McKay | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Knowles | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ANDREW BLACKBURN | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Banks | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Woodhouse Beales | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yu Sheng Hsu | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Seun Opanubi | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Glenn Scott-Evans | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PHIL HORNSEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.