Accounts and annual returns PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UNIVERSITY CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity number: 1130491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window