Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UNIVERSITY CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity number: 1130491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £356.16k £404.60k £589.35k £350.95k £968.96k
Total expenditure £426.68k £422.36k £501.62k £422.85k £747.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.67k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £520.89k N/A £880.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £68.21k N/A £87.43k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £244 N/A £1.10k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £30.00k N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £501.62k N/A £747.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.44k N/A £5.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0