Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UNIVERSITY CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity number: 1130491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVD DR WILLIAM ROBERT STUART LAMB Chair 02 May 2017
ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
Sarah Mortimer Trustee 30 May 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII
Received: On time
Karen Melham Trustee 02 May 2022
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
George Williams Trustee 02 May 2022
None on record
Rev Hannah Cartwright Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Rachel Abernethy Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Terence Cudbird Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
megan Roper Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Victoria Mort Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Laura White Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Tessa Charlotte Blenkinsop Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
Joseph Gregory Andrews Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
Nicholas Hardyman Trustee 22 April 2018
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
MARY LEAN Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
Felix Leach Trustee 15 May 2014
THE DE BROME TRUST
Received: On time
ELEANOR POLLY WILLIAMS Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record