Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. SAVIOUR GREAT MOOR

Charity number: 1132539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window