THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. SAVIOUR GREAT MOOR

Charity number: 1132539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT HOWORTH Trustee 22 September 2014 None on record
DUNCAN WATTS Trustee None on record
Sue Warner Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
MRS CATHY FINNEY Trustee None on record
Alyson Tuft Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
PATRICIA MARY GARRATT Trustee None on record
SARAH JANE SUMMERTON Trustee None on record
ERIN WOOLLASTON Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
JOE WHITE Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
ROGER ERIC SALT ACII Trustee None on record
MADELEINE WATTS RGN Trustee None on record
LINDA SHELMERDINE Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record
Christine Moore Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
ANGELA WILSON Trustee 20 March 2013 None on record
Wendy O'Brien Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
REV CANON DIANE VERONICA COOKSON FSCM Chair None on record