THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, COTTINGHAM (DIOCESE OF YORK)

Charity number: 1131553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £147.93k £122.95k £171.21k £133.43k £86.30k
Total expenditure £149.37k £136.50k £120.75k £126.84k £104.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £350 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A