THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT AYTON WITH EASBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To co-operate with the minister in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH PCC, GREAT AYTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL HARRISON PEVERELL | Chair |
|
||||||
Celia Ann Wilson | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dickinson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Michael Wildsmith | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Prunty | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elizabeth King | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Gillian Hendry | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peter Wilson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Burns Taylor | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Frances Brown | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Winterschladen | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Ruth Land | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER HAROLD TITCHMARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR NICK LAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
REV GEOFF JAQUES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rosemary Elaine Wheway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROBIN HARMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV JON DEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.22k | £164.87k | £171.78k | £195.55k | £164.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.42k | £182.31k | £169.50k | £193.17k | £169.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.99k | £1.89k | N/A | £4.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
LOW GREEN
GREAT AYTON
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS9 6NN
- Phone:
- 01642722333
- Email:
- revpev@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window