Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PRIMROSE HILL WITH ST PAUL, AVENUE RD
Charity number: 1132701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Campbell Gilmour | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Woolf | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parviz Sedighi | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Casey Okoro Oppong | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Carter | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Lozynska | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tindale | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Kabir | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Margaret Jane Carter | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Jane Chesworth | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Hellinikakis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Ding-Vic Chow | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Ross Stephan Gilmour | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roderick William James Monroe | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TED RUSCOE | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ROSE GRACE HEDGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MARK JEREMY WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.