Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE DIVINE, MENSTON WITH WOODHEAD IN THE BRADFORD EPISCOPAL AREA OF THE DIOCESE OF LEEDS
Charity number: 1129823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV STEPHEN PROUDLOVE | Chair | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Knaggs | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Hall | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Shelley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Diane West | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Johnson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Banister | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Thornhill | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Needle | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW HOWORTH | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Mercer | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Smith | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Meakin | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SUE LEE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS H J FEATHERS | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS M BANISTER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.