THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS, SALISBURY

Charity number: 1130133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH JOHN LESLIE Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Sophie Burditt Trustee 16 April 2017 None on record
Michael Roger Neve Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
Rev Matthew Levinsohn Trustee 02 July 2017 None on record
Christopher David Taylor Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
PROF JOHN MICHAEL SQUIRE PHD Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
BRIAN TERENCE WEBB Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
GEORGINA LISTRA POLIUS Trustee 20 September 2020
SALISBURY AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Received: 20 days late
Anita Louise Thorne Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Mark Anthony Venables Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
SALLY REED Trustee None on record
Karen Louise Scott Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
Thomas Alexander Wilkins Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record
Aysha Louise Musson Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
William John Burditt Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Simon James Futcher Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
Toby Ferguson Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Rev Jean Helier Thomson De Garis Chair 29 April 2019 None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Alford Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Jean Alexis Filtness Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
MICHELLE LOUISE BOUCHER Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
Rev SARAH ELIZABETH WOOD-ROE Trustee 13 July 2017
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.LAWRENCE, STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE, WILTS Received: On time
David Lynam Heydon Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Danielle Helen Malone Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record