Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES & EMMANUEL, DIDSBURY

Charity number: 1131669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window