Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES & EMMANUEL, DIDSBURY

Charity number: 1131669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

30 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR ROSEMARY BRENDA MARTIN Trustee 24 April 2023
FRIENDS OF POTTERS VILLAGE
Received: On time
Fiona Macdougall Coulthard Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Michael Paul Greaves Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Jacob Susan Babu Dodda Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Pek Hui Teo Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
John Terence Evans Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Prof Catherine Irena Grugulis Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Lisa Jane Crowther Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Nicola Sherry Massingham Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Marilyn Audrey Evans Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Rev Katrin Alldavoodi Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Vicki Jane Long Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Stephen Peter Penfold Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Rev Kendall Augustine Tanner-Ihm Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Margaret Jackson Trustee 25 April 2021
HOME COMMUNITY CAFE
Received: On time
JONATHAN PARKIN Trustee 25 April 2021
WILLIAM AND FRANCES DOBIE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Overdue by 71 days
Timothy John Turvey Trustee 18 October 2020
THE PARISH HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
Alexander David Sims Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rev Catherine Frances Allison Trustee 01 June 2020
CHURCH URBAN FUND
Received: On time
NEAR NEIGHBOURS
Received: On time
Dr Louise Ruth Smail Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
Elizabeth McKelvey Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
Rev Canon Lisa Katherine Battye Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
JAMES MARTIN WILSON Trustee 01 July 2017
DIDSBURY PARSONAGE TRUST
Received: 65 days late
Greg Mauchline Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
Steven Edward Penny Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
Joyce Margaret Thom Trustee 27 April 2015
None on record
HILARY ANN LOWE Trustee
OZANNE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PARISH HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
HOME COMMUNITY CAFE
Received: On time
REV DR NICHOLAS JOHN BUNDOCK BSC MA PHD Trustee
THE PARISH HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
JEFFREY NORMAN DUNKERLEY Trustee
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ANDREA JANE DUNKERLEY Trustee
None on record