Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW BRIGHTON
Charity number: 1129911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ben Eadon | Chair | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jack David Parsons | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Ross Munn | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony James Firmin | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marren Marie Hager | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Margaret Sutherland-Young | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas James Cotterill | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ayisha Joanna Rosamund Bari | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Marie Blair | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clare Nixon | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Jewell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bonner | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Anne Barnett | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA CAROLE RAWLINGS | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Fermoy Hedgethorne | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DEREK BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBIN TULLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.