Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS HARROW WEALD
Charity number: 1130812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JODY STOWELL | Chair | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Albert Edmunds | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Price | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Helen Deans | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Evelyn Paice | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY MACKENZIE | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENIS ALWYN JACKSON BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT WILLIAM MAY BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON SCOTT STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.