Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR'S SUNBURY

Charity number: 1130267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window