Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR'S SUNBURY

Charity number: 1130267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £495.40k £309.64k £330.93k £341.45k £315.91k
Total expenditure £336.72k £369.15k £354.30k £333.88k £282.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A