Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, TOWCESTER
Charity number: 1130077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Gilbert | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Angela Hammett | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Angela Morris | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Edwards | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celia Stanworth | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE MANNING | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN MORRIS | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|||||
JULIE ANN GODWIN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL BESTWICK | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paula Ella Challen | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE JANE WATTS | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN BOOTH BSc | Trustee | 23 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
REVD LULU PELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.