Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MILDRED TENTERDEN
Charity number: 1130113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LINDSAY JOHN HAMMOND | Chair | 02 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Richard Archer | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
John Badcock | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Kevin Parker | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Tessa Badcock | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr David Dodds | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew Tapsell | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Clive Brian Smith | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Shirley Vivienne Docker | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Patricia Dawn Curtis | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Caroline Salmon | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Stephen James Curtis | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Jeanette Tracy Kennett | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Christopher Northen | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Christopher Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Robin David Lovell | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER CHEESMAN | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr NICHOLAS PAYNE HUDD | Trustee | 11 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
DR NEIL DE VILLIERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.