ELDON CELTIC JFC

Charity number: 1130441
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 April 2021 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 May 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 18 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required